CORPS OF DRUMS SOCIETY FOR THE PRESERVATION OF DRUM AND FIFE MUSIC

Charity number: 1073106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of facilities and advice to enable the Society to carry out the function of preserving and maintaining the Drum, Flute and Bugle tradition.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £8,945
Total expenditure: £9,420

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 December 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CORPS OF DRUMS SOCIETY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Towe Chair 19 January 2024
None on record
Roger Davenport Trustee 29 October 2017
None on record
Graham Thackery Trustee 22 October 2017
None on record
PETER FOSS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.64k £2.08k £2.09k £2.09k £8.95k
Total expenditure £3.77k £2.27k £3.19k £2.12k £9.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 08 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 May 2024 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
14 HEATHFIELDS
TRIMLEY ST. MARTIN
FELIXSTOWE
IP11 0GA
Phone:
01394823471