SUDANESE COMMUNITY AND INFORMATION CENTRE(SCIC)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes Education/Training Disability Relief of Poverty Sport/recreation Economic/Community development/Employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 29 July 1999: Standard registration
- S. C. I. C. (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Omima Etayeb Hassan Eltayeb | Chair | 19 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rasha Khalafalla | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hagir Ahmed | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Maha Solyman | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Awad Ahmed | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
NADIR ELAMIN | Trustee | 19 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eihab Abdelmagid | Trustee | 19 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ikram Ali Taha | Trustee | 19 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED ELFATIH ELNAIEM | Trustee | 19 June 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.47k | £1.82k | £284 | £9.77k | £9.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.92k | £3.75k | £1.13k | £10.60k | £11.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 June 2024 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 April 2022 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 June 2021 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST NOVEMBER 1998 AND AMENDED 21ST JULY 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GREATER LONDON WITH PREFERENCE FOR THOSE INHABITANTS WHO ARE OF SUDANESE ORIGIN AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: (1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING (2) TO PROTECT PUBLIC HEALTH AND TO RELIEVE THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF POV ERTY, SICKNESS AND STRESS (3) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO THOSE IN NEED OF IT (4) THE RELIEF IN NEED OF SUDANESE REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS WHO ARE RESIDENT OR WHO ARE INTENDING TO RESIDE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH ADVICE, ASSISTANCE REPRESENTATION, COUNSELLING, TRANSLATION AND INTERPRETING SERVICES (5) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS OF THE SAID INHABITANTS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
OFFICE 2, CANALSIDE HOUSE
383 LADBROKE GROVE
LONDON
W10 5AA
- Phone:
- 07930696680
- Email:
- info@sudanesecic.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window