THE ACORN MUSIC THEATRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust runs workshops where young performers collaborate to devise performance pieces which are then staged in such venues as are appropriate to the nature of the work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 02 November 1999: Standard registration
- ACORN MUSIC THEATRE COMPANY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eileen Dunwell | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sophie Dix | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lagle-Mai Vincent | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Holly Rosier | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Vannesa Lakates | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SARAH BELL | Trustee | 29 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
TONY SANDERSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
LUCINDA MARY CELYN HENWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.47k | £15.39k | £27.70k | £22.03k | £26.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.42k | £15.89k | £21.68k | £19.60k | £27.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE ART OF THEATRE, MUSIC AND OTHER PERFORMING ARTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE HENLEY-ON-THAMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 HOP GARDENS
HENLEY-ON-THAMES
RG9 2EH
- Phone:
- 01491574064
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window