Financial history NEMPNETT THRUBWELL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1096533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £10.17k £565 £1.06k £1.65k £2.69k
Total expenditure £5.96k £1.80k £3.10k £1.70k £2.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A