HARROW HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To secure the protection, preservation, restoration and improvement of the character and amenities of the London Borough of Harrow, for the benefit and enjoyment of the public generally and especially the inhabitants of Harrow.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Harrow
Governance
- 03 December 1998: Standard registration
- HARROW NATURE CONSERVATION FORUM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SALIM CHOWDHURY | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|||||
June Rosemary Baxter | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ghazanfar Ali B.Com FMAT | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Edward Youle | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|||||
JOHN GORDON WILLIAMS | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RICHARD ORCHARD | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET HUITSON | Trustee | 18 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE RUTH HONAKER BOLSOVER | Trustee | 16 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Janet Mote | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVE BOLSOVER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.75k | £17.23k | £19.67k | £122.21k | £44.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.13k | £13.25k | £17.59k | £59.38k | £29.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.61k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 14 OCTOBER 1998
Charitable objects
(A) TO SECURE THE PROTECTION PRESERVATION, RESTORATION AND IMPROVEMENT TO THE CHARACTER AND AMENITIES OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARROW FOR THE BENEFIT AND ENJOYMENT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND ESPECIALLY THE INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGH; (B) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF LANDS AND BUILDINGS OF BEAUTY OR HISTORIC INTEREST AND (AS REGARDS LANDS) OF ECOLOGICAL OR OTHER SCIENTIFIC OR ENVIRONMENTAL IMPORTANCE WITHIN THE BOROUGH AND (C) TO PROMOTE SCHEMES AND AWARDS FOR PROTECTING AND IMPROVING THE ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HARROW
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Walton Drive
HARROW
HA1 4XA
- Phone:
- 0208933 2823
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window