THE MEADOWS CHILDREN AND FAMILY WING

Charity Number: 1075129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To educate families and the public in better standards of childcare and in the importance of sound relations between parents and children for the maintenance of family life 2) The relief of poverty and the provision of recreational facilities or other leisure time occupation in the interest of social welfare with the object of improving the conditions of life

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £124,529
Total expenditure: £177,943

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 April 1999: Standard registration
  • 05 August 2015: Funds received from 1066622 EAST CAMBS FAMILY PROJECT
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sharon Louise Livermore Chair 19 November 2020
None on record
Nicola Wallis Trustee 29 November 2022
THE KINGS HEDGES FAMILY SUPPORT PROJECT
Received: On time
PLAYLANDERS PRE-SCHOOL
Received: 240 days late
Peninnah Sarah Serrano Trustee 29 November 2022
None on record
Angelina Muller Trustee 04 November 2021
None on record
Dr Zarah Jawad Trustee 04 November 2021
None on record
Claire Thompson Trustee 04 November 2021
None on record
Stacey May Trustee 26 October 2018
None on record
Junko Grant-Hotsuki Trustee 28 July 2015
None on record
Petra Beranova Trustee 29 November 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £126.74k £201.35k £152.16k £221.35k £124.53k
Total expenditure £138.44k £162.84k £186.68k £156.29k £177.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £94.19k £94.93k £130.16k £155.33k £92.31k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 04 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 04 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Meadows Community Centre
299 Arbury Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 2JL
Phone:
01223 508144
Website:

No information available