Financial history CABIN LANE CHURCH

Charity number: 1073517
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £159.38k £154.37k £109.97k £127.35k £153.32k
Total expenditure £144.74k £134.66k £115.74k £113.51k £134.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.72k £28.02k £2.89k N/A