WILLENHALL COMMUNITY MONEY ADVICE CENTRE

Charity number: 1074826
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide welfare rights and money advice services to local residents facing economic problems, to include face to face advice at Willenhall Advice Centre Offices plus other venues in neighbouring communities. Housing and working to develop the south east Credit Union and enable it to expand its savings, loans and insurance facilities within its Common Bond.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015

Total income: £157,987
Total expenditure: £124,673

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Coventry City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 March 1999: Standard registration
  • 25 May 2016: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
  • 25 May 2016: Funds transferred to 1015216 COVENTRY INDEPENDENT ADVICE SERVICE
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • WILLENHALL ADVICE CENTRE (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £125.88k £115.66k £117.19k £112.96k £157.99k
Total expenditure £179.68k £144.58k £146.18k £133.46k £124.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £140.74k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 07 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 07 December 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 10 April 2015 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 10 April 2015 69 days late
Annual return 31 March 2013 10 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 05 December 2014 308 days late