Accounts and annual returns DORSET ROAD COMMUNITY CENTRE (ATHERTON) LIMITED

Charity number: 1077240
Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 04 September 2024 212 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 04 September 2024 212 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 14 March 2023 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 14 March 2023 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 13 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 13 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 13 December 2021 311 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 13 December 2021 311 days late Download Open in new window