Financial history DORSET ROAD COMMUNITY CENTRE (ATHERTON) LIMITED

Charity number: 1077240
Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023
Total gross income £35.72k £35.72k £30.78k £42.65k £41.86k
Total expenditure £46.29k £46.29k £36.84k £39.79k £47.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £19.31k £11.17k £7.55k