DORSET ROAD COMMUNITY CENTRE (ATHERTON) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running Dorset Road Community Centre with volunteers and staff to enhance the offer for local residents and user groups in Atherton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
Total income includes £7,549 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wigan
Governance
- 01 September 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
trudy Hodgkinson | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsey Murray | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
JAMIE HODGKINSON | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
NORMAN ALEC BRADBURY | Trustee | 19 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE SARAH HOLMES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.72k | £35.72k | £30.78k | £42.65k | £41.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.29k | £46.29k | £36.84k | £39.79k | £47.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £19.31k | £11.17k | £7.55k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 87 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 87 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 September 2024 | 212 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 September 2024 | 212 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 13 December 2021 | 311 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 13 December 2021 | 311 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 MAY 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 JULY 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE BENEFITS FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THEREON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OR POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL INHABITANTS IN THE FOLLOWING MANNER A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND GUIDANCE UPON QUESTIONS OF HOUSING, SOCIAL WELFARE BENEFITS, UNEMPLOYMENT, HEALTH RELATED TOPICS. B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO EQUIPPING THEM FOR EMPLOYMENT AND FACILITATING THEIR OBTAINING WORK IN INDUSTRY COMMERCE AND THE PROFESSIONS D) TO PROVIDE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES
Area of benefit
ATHERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
DORSET ROAD
ATHERTON
MANCHESTER
M46 9GJ
- Phone:
- 01942884184
- Email:
- DORSETROADCC@YAHOO.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window