FRIENDS OF THOMAS A BECKET JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to provide funds for projects and activities to benefit children at Thomas A Becket Junior School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- West Sussex
Governance
- 29 March 1999: Standard registration
- THOMAS A BECKET MIDDLE FOS (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF THOMAS A BECKET MIDDLE SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLAIRE HUXHAM | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Mayes | Trustee | 19 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.21k | £13.24k | £4.38k | £21.84k | £19.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.61k | £6.60k | £1.92k | £30.76k | £19.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 17TH NOVEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED ON 23/09/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE WORTHING, WEST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thomas A Becket Junior School
25 Glebeside Avenue
WORTHING
BN14 7PR
- Phone:
- 01903206127
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window