Financial history THE DOREEN ASPEY MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1074533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.60k £544 £109 £2.49k £4.39k
Total expenditure £4.22k £1.68k £287 £477 £1.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A