KANLUNGAN FILIPINO CONSORTIUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conducts education, training, arts and cultural workshops on issues affecting Filipino migrant workers. The organisation holds advocacy work and provides support to Filipinos to help in their integration in the British society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £136,112 from 1 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 31 August 1999: Standard registration
- 18 January 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 18 January 2024: Funds transferred to 1196865 KANLUNGAN FILIPINO CONSORTIUM
- KANLUNGAN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.28k | £8.21k | £16.52k | £268.02k | £489.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.95k | £12.51k | £21.94k | £178.94k | £279.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £136.11k | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | £20.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH JULY 1998, AS AMENDED 11TH MAY 1999 as amended on 31 Aug 2013
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE BENEFIT OF FILIPINO PEOPLE OR PEOPLE OF FILIPINO DESCENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ; 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY SKILLS TO OBTAIN EMPLOYMENT OR TO BECOME SELF-EMPLOYED AND ADVICE IN MATTERS CONCERNING HOUSING, BENEFIT AND IMMIGRATION.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window