AQUABATS SPORTS AND SOCIAL CLUB FOR VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Swimming, other sports & social events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 06 August 1999: Standard registration
- AQUABATS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karina Mary Gregory | Trustee | 22 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Edris Waveney Miller | Trustee | 22 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jason Robert Beal | Trustee | 22 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Anton Pemberton | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pardeep Singh Gill | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul O'Loughlin | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN BAMBER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Timothy David Bamber | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Arthur Brian Payne | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £514 | £14 | £1.33k | £1.93k | £1.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.37k | £68 | £866 | £2.24k | £1.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12TH MAY 1998.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE IN GREATER LONDON IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROCKFIELD HOUSE
ROCKFIELD ROAD
OXTED
RH8 0EJ
- Phone:
- 01883730297
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window