Accounts and annual returns GILLINGHAM COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity Number: 1073175
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 21 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 21 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 31 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 31 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 29 February 2008 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 29 February 2008 29 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 29 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 29 January 2007 On Time