THE PETER SHALSON FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To apply or allocate the capital and income of the trust for the benefit of such charities as the Trustees may from time to time in their absolute discretion select.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 January 1999: Standard registration
- 07 July 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2006 | 05/04/2007 | 05/04/2008 | 05/04/2009 | 05/04/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £619.63k | £229.23k | £254.28k | £0 | £718 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.11m | £615.97k | £234.08k | £110.66k | £3.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | 18 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | 18 June 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | 26 April 2010 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | 26 April 2010 | 80 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | 04 February 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | 04 February 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | 11 April 2008 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | 13 February 2008 | 8 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | 29 March 2010 | 1148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | 11 April 2008 | 431 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2ND DECEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FOR THE PERIOD OF TWENTY ONE YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ANY YEAR ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME AT COMPOUND INTEREST BY INVESTING THE SAME AND THE RESULTING INCOME IN ANY OF THE AUTHORISED INVESTMENTS AND HOLD THE SAME AS AN ACCRETION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window