MIDDLETON-IN-TEESDALE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to award financial assistance to 16 - 21 year old students in the parish of Middleton-in-Teesdale
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Durham
Governance
- 25 January 1999: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Miller | Trustee | 13 July 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Alan Thompson | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Barbara Graham Moore | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
RICHARD BELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £791 | £1.08k | £1.02k | £1.20k | £1.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £250 | £0 | £1.00k | £1.00k | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2024 | 337 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2021 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 11 MARCH 1954 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 21 JUNE 2006 AND 30 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF MIDDLETON-IN-TEESDALE EXHIBITIONS TENABLE AT ANY SECONDARY SCHOOL, TRAINING COLLEGE FOR TEACHERS, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER EDUCATION APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES, TO BE AWARDED UNDER RULES TO BE MADE BY THE TRUSTEES FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR ANY OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT, TO PREPARE FOR, OR TO ASSIST THEIR ENTRY INTO, A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING OTHERWISE PROMOTING EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING
Area of benefit
MIDDLETON-IN-TEESDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICARAGE
1 Greta Place
Middleton-in-Teesdale
BARNARD CASTLE
DL12 0RD
- Phone:
- 01833641302
- Email:
- alisonwallbank59@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window