Fischer Family Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the trust are the advancement of education, historical and medical research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- City Of York
- Oxfordshire
- Colombia
Governance
- 12 May 1999: Standard registration
- FISCHER FAMILY TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James West | Trustee | 18 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Williams Brooks | Trustee |
|
||||||
MICHAEL FISCHER | Trustee |
|
||||||
GORDON JAMES MCMILLAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.16m | £2.49m | £5.01m | £57.83k | £127.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.01m | £2.59m | £1.27m | £1.85m | £334.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.13m | £2.48m | £5.00m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £27.52k | £16.06k | £13.45k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.01m | £2.59m | £1.27m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.70k | £6.55k | £5.40k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £987.41k | £2.55m | £1.18m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8 DECEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 21 APRIL 1999. as amended on 03 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE. 2. FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUST DEED IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fischer Family Trust
5-7 West Central
127 Olympic Avenue
Milton Park
Milton
OX14 4SA
- Phone:
- 01235827400
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window