WESSEX CLOSE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wessex Christian Fellowship is as it suggests a fellowship offering a variety of church and non church based community and social 'clubs'.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 16 December 1998: Standard registration
- WESSEX CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEN GOLDING | Chair | 09 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Kim Christina AUSTEN | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Agyemang KONADU | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Michael | Trustee | 30 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barry Alan Darling | Trustee | 30 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ebow Essel | Trustee | 30 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.92k | £72.15k | £72.20k | £84.99k | £82.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.04k | £61.51k | £77.35k | £105.67k | £78.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND TRUST DEED DATED 16 SEPTEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 25TH JULY 2003
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD.
Area of benefit
BASINGSTOKE
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESSEX CLOSE
BASINGSTOKE
HAMPSHIRE
RG21 3NP
- Phone:
- 01256329988
- Email:
- info@bwcf.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window