FRIENDS OF SIR ROBERT HITCHAM SCHOOL ( DEBENHAM )

Charity number: 1073121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the Association is to advance the education of pupils in the school - a) Develop relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school. b) Engage in activities which support the school and advance the education of the pupils attending it. c) Provide facilities or items for education (not provided from statutory funds).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £5,356
Total expenditure: £3,434

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 December 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Bendall Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Jennifer Bendall Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £945 £4.28k £3.49k £3.36k £5.36k
Total expenditure £761 £1.62k £8.65k £1.53k £3.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 04 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 04 November 2024 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 November 2024 493 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Derry Brook Lane
Debenham
Stowmarket
Suffolk
IP14 6PX
Phone:
01728860201
Website:

No information available