Financial history OWLERTON WESLEYAN REFORM CHURCH

Charity Number: 1073821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £27.71k £25.42k £26.34k £29.28k £29.78k
Total expenditure £23.61k £13.17k £11.81k £18.44k £15.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A