OWLERTON WESLEYAN REFORM CHURCH

Charity number: 1073821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Place of Worship Provide Christian Teaching through sermons Bible Study and Prayer Meetings Outreach into Local Community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £29,778
Total expenditure: £15,884

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 February 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • OWLERTON EVANGELICAL CHURCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Fenwick Trustee 09 October 2019
None on record
Anthony Houghton Trustee 09 October 2019
None on record
DOREEN WILKINSON Trustee
None on record
ANNE COCKER Trustee
None on record
MAUREEN ROBINSON Trustee
None on record
BERNARD WILKINSON Trustee
None on record
MURIEL GADD Trustee
None on record
MARGARET ANNE BROWN Trustee
None on record
KATHLEEN JULIA HODSON Trustee
HAMPDEN VIEW WESLEYAN REFORM CHURCH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £27.71k £25.42k £26.34k £29.28k £29.78k
Total expenditure £23.61k £13.17k £11.81k £18.44k £15.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 20 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 6
Stanwood Court
15 Stanwood Road
Sheffield
S6 5JE
Phone:
01142343005
Email:
No information available