HARRINGTON RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary objective of the charity is to: Engage with all sections of the community To support local community activities designed to improve the quality life for young and old For example: To facilitate projects and amenities for young people Extra curricular school activities community trips for older people in order to combat loneliness and isolation Christmas lunch for the elderly
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 October 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 19 June 1999: Standard registration
- H.M.R.A.G (Working name)
- HARRINGTON MARINA REGENERATION ACTION GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brenda Herbert | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Crow Trustee | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Henry Crowe | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stan Herbert | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE THOMPSON Trustee | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Bridie O'Donnell Treasurer | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/10/2020 | 05/10/2021 | 05/10/2022 | 05/10/2023 | 05/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £254 | £30 | £175 | £3.34k | £171 | |
|
Total expenditure | £774 | £14 | £450 | £3.85k | £2.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 October 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 October 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 October 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 October 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 October 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/09/1998 AS AMENDED ON 21/04/1999 AS AMENDED ON 09/10/2002 AS AMENDED ON 30/01/2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND REPAIR HARRINGTON MARINA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 STAINBURN ROAD
STAINBURN
WORKINGTON
CA14 1SW
- Phone:
- 01900605830
- Email:
- wherbert123@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window