Financial history U3A HENLEY-ON-THAMES

Charity number: 1074565
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012
Total gross income £2.35k £2.28k £2.18k £2.75k £2.70k
Total expenditure £2.24k £2.15k £2.25k £2.06k £2.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A