METROPOLITAN POLICE WIDOWS' AND WIDOWERS' FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of serving officers, widows or widowers of serving or retired police officers who are in need, hardship or distress; by awards of grants, providing or paying of goods, services or facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 January 1999: Standard registration
- 29 May 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 29 May 2009: Funds transferred to 1125409 METROPOLITAN POLICE BENEVOLENT FUND
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.64k | £75.85k | £71.96k | £58.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £419.98k | £238.65k | £257.25k | £311.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 19 January 2009 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 21 January 2009 | 82 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 30 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 30 October 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 30 November 2006 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 30 November 2006 | 30 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 21 November 2005 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 21 November 2005 | 21 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 9 DECEMBER 1998, AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION OF THE TRUSTEES DATED 24 JULY 2000, AND SCHEME DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
"QUALIFIED" MEANS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (1) THE RELIEF OF QUALIFIED SERVING POLICE OFFICERS; (2) THE RELIEF OF QUALIFIED WIDOWS OR WIDOWERS OF SERVING OR RETIRED POLICE OFFICERS; AND (3) INSOFAR AS THE TRUSTEES CANNOT EXPEND THE CHARITY'S FUNDS TOWARDS THE OBJECTS ABOVE THEY MAY BE APPLIED FOR THE RELIEF OF QUALIFIED RETIRED POLICE OFFICERS, IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS THE TRUSTEES MAY: A) ASSIST IN PAYING THE COST OF FUNERAL AND OTHER EXPENSES WHICH ARE INCURRED BY OR ON BEHALF OF THOSE QUALIFIED AT THE TIME OF THEIR DEATH UNDER THE OBJECTS ABOVE, AND WHICH HAVE NOT BEEN PAID AT THE TIME OF THEIR DEATH; B) MAKE GRANTS OR LOANS OF MONEY TO THOSE QUALIFIED; C) PROVIDE OR PAY FOR GOODS SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE QUALIFIED; D) MAKE GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE QUALIFIED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window