FRIENDS OF REDLANDS

Charity number: 1074531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide events and activities for the purpose of raising funds for the benefit of the children of the school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £6,844
Total expenditure: £9,430

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 March 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hannah Hancock Chair 18 November 2024
None on record
Emma Louise Elderfield Trustee 18 November 2024
None on record
AJ Nicholas Trustee 18 November 2024
None on record
Hannah Sperring Trustee 18 November 2024
None on record
Madeleine Butler Trustee 18 November 2024
None on record
Karen Davies Trustee 26 November 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £12.41k £9.19k £7.20k £7.42k £6.84k
Total expenditure £16.18k £6.70k £9.36k £5.92k £9.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 03 July 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Redlands Cp School
Redlands Lane
Fareham
PO16 0UD
Phone:
01329234012
Website:

No information available