THE COALFIELDS REGENERATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant Making Organisation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£5,231,000
Donations and legacies | £3.37m | |
Charitable activities | £1.07m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £701.00k | |
Other | £90.00k |
Total expenditure:
£4,913,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £4.20m | |
Other | £713.00k |
-£480,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,207,000 from 10 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £713.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.20m | |
Retained for future use | £318.00k |
People

53 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 March 1999: Standard registration
- 14 November 2018: Funds received from 1095545 GET SORTED ACADEMY OF MUSIC
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bethan Winter | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Robin Alan Simmons | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Francis Miles | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joan Elizabeth Dixon | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda McAvan | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
LINDA ROSE RUTTER | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Keith Cunliffe | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Trudie McGuinness | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Stubbs | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Young | Trustee | 21 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CLAPHAM | Trustee | 31 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
WAYNE THOMAS | Trustee |
|
||||||
NICOLAS WILSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.08m | £6.57m | £6.00m | £5.14m | £5.23m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.70m | £5.94m | £5.97m | £4.18m | £4.91m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £336.00k | £170.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.34m | £2.56m | £1.21m | £1.63m | £1.21m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.30m | £2.55m | £1.30m | £4.00m | £3.37m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £103.00k | £95.90k | £112.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £353.00k | £574.99k | £776.00k | £653.00k | £1.07m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.27m | £3.28m | £3.78m | £487.00k | £701.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £47.00k | £61.07k | £33.00k | £0 | £90.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.59m | £4.93m | £4.23m | £4.18m | £4.20m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £156.00k | £135.55k | £107.00k | £127.00k | £120.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.14m | £2.49m | £1.44m | £1.10m | £874.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £1.11m | £1.01m | £1.73m | £0 | £713.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.66m | £1.70m | £5.16m | £861.00k | £365.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £42.27m | £47.15m | £58.81m | £15.99m | £16.21m | |
|
Other assets | £7.77m | £8.12m | £8.57m | £22.68m | £23.23m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £761.00k | £805.00k | £2.95m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £14.80m | £15.87m | £24.51m | £895.00k | £845.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCORPORATED 19/03/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/10/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/03/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/04/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/03/2012 as amended on 08 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN THE COALFIELDS AREAS IN ENGLAND, WALES AND SCOTLAND (IN THIS MEMORANDUM AND IN THESE ARTICLES "COALFIELDS AREAS" SHALL MEAN ANY AREAS IN ENGLAND, WALES AND SCOTLAND WHERE COAL MINING IS OR HAS IN THE PAST BEEN CARRIED OUT) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG THE UNEMPLOYED AND PROVIDING THE UNEMPLOYED WITH WORK EXPERIENCE THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE, BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE UNEMPLOYED IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP : IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR TO EXISTING BUSINESSES THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LANDS FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND/OR THOSE WHO BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION FOR ENGLAND WALES 2. THE RELIEF OF THE AGED AND THE SICK FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT
Area of benefit
THE COALFIELDS AREAS IN ENGLAND WALES AND SCOTLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE COALFIELDS REGENERATION TRUST
1 WATERSIDE PARK
VALLEY WAY
WOMBWELL
BARNSLEY
S73 0BB
- Phone:
- 01226272810
- Email:
- info@coalfields-regen.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window