THE RALPH AND MERIEL RICHARDSON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The support of established actors and actresses and their families who are experiencing seriously hard times.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 February 1999: Standard registration
- THE RICHARDSON FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN EAGLES | Chair | 29 November 1999 |
|
|||||||
Frederick Samson Morice Fox | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Hyams | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|||||||
Nickolas Grace | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||
MARJORIE EAGLES | Trustee | 29 November 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.57k | £42.70k | £43.50k | £66.01k | £102.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.22k | £24.96k | £29.05k | £31.22k | £25.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 22 April 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 22 April 2021 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLE SOF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20TH NOVEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 FEB 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 NOV 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 JAN 2010
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF BRITISH ACTORS AND ACTRESSES WHO HAVE PROFESSIONALLY PRACTISED OR CONTRIBUTED TO THE THEATRICAL ARTS (ON STAGE RADIO OR TELEVISION) AND THEIR SPOUSES AND CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
107 FROGNAL
LONDON
NW3 6XR
- Phone:
- 02075295420
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
sirralphrichardson.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window