CONSORTIUM OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Consortium is the only national second tier organisation which specifically represents and supports Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual and Transgender (LGBT) Voluntary and Community Organisations. We exist to see a vibrant, viable and valued LGBT Voluntary and Community Sector. We provide a voice for the sector, link it together, collect information and lead on developing a shared vision.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£560,533
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £554.10k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £6.43k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£604,932
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £604.93k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £604.93k |
People

17 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 August 2004: Standard registration
- CONSORTIUM OF LGBT VOLUNTARY & COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS (Working name)
- CONSORTIUM OF LGBTVCOS (Working name)
- CONSORTIUM OF LGBVCOS (Working name)
- LGBT CONSORTIUM (Working name)
- CONSORTIUM OF LESBIAN, GAY AND BISEXUAL VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yatin Mistry | Chair | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Alessandro Ceccarelli | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|||||||
Callum Pethick | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Pavlo Cherednychenko | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rico Jacob Alexander Young | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Hannah Pittman | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Miss Emily Macaulay | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|||||||
Ipek Leni Candan | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £741.81k | £1.21m | £881.73k | £738.87k | £560.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £767.02k | £987.23k | £531.75k | £1.14m | £604.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £161.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £49.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £741.27k | £1.21m | £881.63k | £736.31k | £554.10k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £543 | £105 | £97 | £2.56k | £6.43k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £767.02k | £987.23k | £531.75k | £1.13m | £604.93k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.54k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.42k | £5.31k | £6.21k | £8.77k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £400.00k | £597.60k | £21.50k | £588.50k | £42.71k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.15k | £3.13k | £6.66k | £7.21k | £6.56k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £189.33k | £436.44k | £796.51k | £414.03k | £306.99k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £10.64k | £40.90k | £54.51k | £69.44k | £6.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/11/2012 as amended on 04 Nov 2017 as amended on 14 Nov 2020 as amended on 13 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
A) 1. TO PROMOTE THE LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (I) ASSOCIATING VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, GOVERNMENTAL, PUBLIC AND PRIVATE BODIES TO DEVELOP AND MAXIMISE THE EFFECTIVENESS OF VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS RUN BY AND FOR LESBIANS GAY MEN, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER PEOPLE (II) PROMOTING GOOD PRACTICE WITHIN MEMBER ORGANISATIONS 2 TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (I) RAISING AWARENESS OF ALL ASPECTS OF DISCRIMINATION IN SOCIETY BY PUBLICATIONS, LECTURES, MEDIA, PUBLIC ADVOCACY AND OTHER MEANS OF COMMUNICATION (II) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS OF THE SAME TO THE PUBLIC (III) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WHETHER BY TEACHING OR PRODUCING MATERIALS (IV) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY THE USE OF PUBLICATIONS, CODES OF PRACTICE, SCHEMES FOR EMPLOYERS, AWARD SCHEMES, THE MEDIA AND PUBLIC ADVOCACY
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ZONE 5
WRENTHAM BUSINESS CENTRE
PROSPECT PARK
EXETER
EX4 6NA
- Phone:
- 02070646500
- Email:
- admin@consortium.lgbt
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window