Financial history THE SWANSEA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1086884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.68k £1.39k £341 £3.20k £7.58k
Total expenditure £0 £12.00k £6.00k £8.00k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A