WHITTINGTON CASTLE PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation of ancient building and grounds-interpretation to public at large. Charity events connected with the site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
Governance
- 26 April 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stewart Tan | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Hamilton-Hill | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
SARAH THURSFIELD | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
THE LADY NEWBOROUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS A HAMILTON-HILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.42k | £156.74k | £259.12k | £225.44k | £234.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.88k | £53.88k | £228.14k | £173.92k | £263.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.52k | £39.18k | £7.29k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 DECEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 JANUARY 1999. AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 22 JULY 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE PARISH OF WHITTINGTON, SHROPSHIRE AND OF THE NATION ("THE BENEFICIARIES"), THE HISTORIC, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTION HERITAGE THAT MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND THE PARISH OF WHITTINGTON, SHROPSHIRE ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") IN BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY BUILDING AS DEFINED IN SECTION 336 OF THE TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING ACT 1990) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST, THE RESTORATION, RENOVATION AND CONSERVATION OF GARDENS, PARKLAND, PLANNED LANDSCAPES AND ESTATES DIRECTLY RELATED TO SUCH BUILDINGS, INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING ACQUIRING, RENOVATING, AND RESTORING AND UTILISING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BENEFICIARIES THE STRUCTURE, CURTILAGES, SITE AND ENVIRONS OF WHITTINGTON CASTLE, WHITTINGTON, SHROPSHIRE AND TO EDUCATE THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY, ARCHITECTURE AND ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL HISTORY OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT ("THE OBJECTS")
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF WHITTINGTON, SHROPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whittington Castle Preservation Tru
TRUST
Whittington Castle
Castle Street
Whittington
OSWESTRY
- Phone:
- 01691662500
- Email:
- info@whittingtoncastle.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window