Trustees BATH PHILHARMONIA
Charity number: 1073393

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Brown | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Hipperson | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Philip Horn | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Howard Ridgeon | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Elizabeth Halls | Trustee | 24 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Victoria Davies | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adam Powell | Trustee | 21 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Declan Daly | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christina Avison | Trustee | 05 May 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.