THREE BRIDGES FREE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A church based in Three Bridges, Crawley. It holds two services every Sunday and various meetings throughout the week including bible studies and for various groups including mums and toddlers, youth groups and senior citizens. It works with other churches in the Sussex and Surrey area and supports the Federation of Independent Evangelical Churches and other churches and charities overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 04 March 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK PASH | Chair | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
KEN KWOK KIN CHIU | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID FRANCIS PARKER | Trustee | 28 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yuri Lourenco Vidal | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev PETER DAVID TAYLOR | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Robert Collingham | Trustee | 08 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT PAUL CRANFIELD | Trustee | 24 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM RICHARD BELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.57k | £124.66k | £105.36k | £174.10k | £151.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.16k | £99.55k | £129.29k | £143.42k | £161.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17TH NOVEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 6TH FEBRUARY 1999
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH THE PROCLAMATION OF THE GOSPEL OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST
Area of benefit
WEST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Three Bridges Free Church
Three Bridges Road
Three Bridges
CRAWLEY
RH10 1LS
- Phone:
- 01293 403142
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window