Trustees THREE BRIDGES FREE CHURCH
Charity number: 1074518

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK PASH | Chair | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
KEN KWOK KIN CHIU | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID FRANCIS PARKER | Trustee | 28 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yuri Lourenco Vidal | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev PETER DAVID TAYLOR | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Robert Collingham | Trustee | 08 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT PAUL CRANFIELD | Trustee | 24 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM RICHARD BELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.