Financial history TROWBRIDGE AREA COMMUNITY LINK SCHEME

Charity number: 1075506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £39.49k £11.12k £29.95k £47.77k £66.47k
Total expenditure £38.84k £11.64k £27.89k £42.82k £44.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k N/A £1.00k £5.65k £9.28k