Governing document VEOLIA NORTH THAMES TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/08/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/01/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/05/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29/05/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31/03/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 08/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/08/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/08/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/04/2013
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAVERING AND ADJACENT LAND IN THE BOROUGH OF THURROCK SOUTH OF THE A13 AND LONDON - TILBURY RAILWAY LINE.COMPRISING THE WENNINGTON AND AVELEY MARSHES WITH PRIORITY TO THE WARDS OF RAINHAM, SOUTH HORN CHURCH AND AIRFIELD AND IN ADDITION TO THE WESTERN BOUNDARY A 20 METRE LINE TO BE DRAWN TO THE WEST OF THE BEAM RIVER (BROADLY A NORTH TO SOUTH RIVER, THAT SERVES AS A BOUNDARY BETWEEN BARKING AND DAGENHAM AND HAVERING) DOWN FROM THE A124 AT RONEO CORNER, ROMFORD TO THE RIVER THAMES THROUGH THE: 3.1 PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY RESTORING OR RECLAIMING LAND WHICH CAN OTHERWISE BE USED FOR ECONOMIC, SOCIAL OR ENVIRONMENTAL PURPOSES BY REASON OF - POLLUTION DAMAGE CAUSED BY AN ACTIVITY PREVIOUSLY CARRIED OUT ON THE LAND; 3.2 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 3.2.1 PREVENTING OR REDUCING ANY POTENTIAL CAUSES OF POLLUTION IN RELATION TO ANY LAND WHICH HAS SUFFERED OR MAY SUFFER POLLUTION AS A RESULT OF AN ACTIVITY PREVIOUSLY CARRIED OUT ON THE LAND; OR 3.2.2 REMEDYING OR MITIGATING THE EFFECTS OF ANY POLLUTION IN RELATION TO LAND WHICH HAS SUFFERED OR MAY SUFFER POLLUTION AS A RESULT OF AN ACTIVITY PREVIOUSLY CARRIED OUT ON THE LAND: 3.3 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 3.3.1 EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN THE BENEFITS TO THE ENVIRONMENT OF SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES; AND 3.3.2 CONDUCTING RESEARCH INTO SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH (IN THIS ARTICLE, "SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES" SHALL MEAN WASTE MINIMISATION, MINIMISATION OF POLLUTION AND HARMFUL WASTE, RE-USE OF WASTE, WASTE RECOVERY ACTIVITIES AND CLEARANCE OF POLLUTANTS FROM CONTAMINATED LAND). 3.4 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 3.4.1 THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE OR IMPROVEMENT OF A PUBLIC PARK, RECREATION GROUND OR OPEN SPACE; OR 3.4.2 THE PROVISION OF SOME OTHER PUBLIC AMENITY IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE PROVIDED THAT ANY PUBLIC PARK, RECREATION GROUND, OPEN SPACE OR PUBLIC AMENITY PROVIDED, MAINTAINED, OR IMPROVED BY VIRTUE OF THIS ARTICLE SHALL NOT BE OPERATED FOR PROFIT (IN THIS ARTICLE, "LANDFILL SITE" SHALL HAVE THE MEANING ASCRIBED BY SECTION 66 OF THE FINANCE ACT 1996). 3.5 THE PROTECTION AND.PRESERVATION OF THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE MAINTENANCE, REPAIR OR RESTORATION OF A BUILDING OR OTHER STRUCTURE WHICH IS OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST AND IS IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE: PROVIDED THAT ANY BUILDING OR OTHER STRUCTURE MAINTAINED, REPAIRED OR RESTORED BY VIRTUE OF THIS ARTICLE SHALL BE OPEN TO THE PUBLIC AND PROVIDED THAT ANY SUCH BUILDING OR STRUCTURE IS NOT OPERATED FOR PROFIT (IN THIS ARTICLE, "LANDFILL SITE" SHALL HAVE THE MEANING ASCRIBED BY SECTION 66 OF THE FINANCE ACT 1996)".
Area of benefit
REFER TO GOVERNING DOCUMENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.