GAINFORD RIVERSIDE MILLENNIUM GREEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide open space for recreation and conservation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 18 March 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GAINFORD RIVERSIDE MILLENNIUM GREEN LTD | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.25k | £508 | £1.07k | £1.31k | £1.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130 | £1.10k | £358 | £505 | £469 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 10 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 May 2025 | 284 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14/12/1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 29/01/2010
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN AN OPEN SPACE TO BE KNOWN AS GAINFORD RIVERSIDE MILLENNIUM GREEN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND TO BE USED FOR EVER AS AN AREA FOR INFORMAL RECREATION PLAY AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS, A MEETING PLACE OR PLACE FOR COMMUNITY EVENTS AND FOR OTHER LAWFUL PURPOSES CONSISTENT WITH THESE TRUSTS FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
GAINFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Virginia House
5 North Terrace
Gainford
Darlington
County Durham
DL2 3EE
- Phone:
- 01325730224
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window