ELLACOMBE CARERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association gives grants to organisations and individuals to deal with Dementia and Alzheimers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
Governance
- 14 May 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHYLLIS HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OLIVE MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 27TH MARCH 1999.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ALZHEIMER'S TYPE DISEASE AND CHRONIC BRAIN FAILURE BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND AMENITIES AT THE ELLACOMBE UNIT, NORWICH, SUPPLEMENTARY TO THOSE PROVIDED BY THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE OR OTHERWISE PROVIDED OUT OF STATUTORY FUNDS AND BY THE SUPPORT OF THE CARERS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Cooper Road
Windlesham
GU20 6EA
- Phone:
- 07766233581
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window