Accounts and annual returns SINGLE PARENT ACTION NETWORK
Charity number: 1092929
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 12 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 12 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 21 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2015
(These accounts |
15 February 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 30 May 2015 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2014
(These accounts |
15 September 2015 | 138 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window