LNER (GC) HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisting in the development of the former Great Central Railway, the Nottingham Heritage Centre and such organisations related to these operations, or such similar projects which are considered to be worthy to receive the support of the trust
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 08 October 1999: Standard registration
- L.N.E.R. (G.C.) TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Phillip Fillingham | Chair | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Sharpe | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Roe | Trustee | 09 June 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.56k | £12.52k | £10.24k | £39.05k | £59.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.60k | £17.84k | £10.70k | £24.85k | £66.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 8 SEPTEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC OF NOTTINGHAM, THE COUNTY OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND THE EAST MIDLANDS (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION CLAUSE 3)
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, EAST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Grange Avenue
Ruddington
Nottingham
England
NG11 6BD
- Phone:
- 01159405705
- Email:
- karensharpe50@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
lnergctrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window