Financial history HEYHOUSES SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1073435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/08/2019 01/08/2020 01/08/2021 01/08/2022 01/08/2023
Total gross income £10.31k £6.90k £5.82k £9.90k £20.15k
Total expenditure £8.65k £9.48k £978 £9.38k £20.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A