Financial history NETHERTHORPE AND UPPERTHORPE COMMUNITY ALLIANCE

Charity number: 1077083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.76m £1.70m £2.50m £2.17m £1.83m
Total expenditure £1.65m £1.66m £2.23m £2.28m £2.11m
Income from government contracts £1.12m £773.48k £1.44m £1.41m £1.09m
Income from government grants £80.00k £185.50k £221.50k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £771 £229.15k £79.61k £496 £368
Income - Other trading activities £25.03k £1.63k £14.81k £432 £896
Income - Charitable activities £1.69m £1.43m £2.36m £1.66m £1.23m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £44.00k £43.76k £45.99k £42.49k £44.52k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £420.21k £548.56k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.65m £1.66m £2.23m £2.28m £2.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.37k £11.07k £11.57k £15.46k £21.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £9.19k £18.80k £166.00k £123.53k £29.04k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0