KINGSTON UPON THAMES BOROUGH-WIDE NEIGHBOURHOOD WATCH ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The General Public/mankind
- Kingston Upon Thames
Governance
- 03 March 1999: Standard registration
- 06 April 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £500 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 14 August 2008 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 22ND OCTOBER 1998.
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND GREATER PUPLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE REDUCTION OF CRIME IN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES 2) TO PROVIDE A MECHANISM FOR EFFECTIVE CONSULTATION BETWEEN THE STATUTORY CRIME AND DISORDER REDUCTION PARTNERSHIP AND RESIDENTS, INCLUDING YOUNG PEOPLE AND RESIDENTS, INCLUDING YOUNG PEOPLE AND ETHNIC COMMUNITIES, WITH A VIEW TO ENNHANCING COMMUNITY SAFETY IN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES.
Area of benefit
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window