LEICESTERSHIRE LEICESTER AND RUTLAND HEADWAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide support and advice to people with acquired brain injuries
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £72,815 from 2 government contract(s) and £10,600 from 4 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Rutland
Governance
- 17 February 1999: Standard registration
- HEADWAY LEICESTER (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REG PERRINS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Danielle Jane Young | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Gerrard | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Palmer | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dedunu Samudrika De Silva | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Lewis | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tharmananthar Shankaradhas | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN NOTTRIDGE | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Howard Sworn | Trustee | 20 September 2013 |
|
|||||
Christopher McKinney | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL BIRCH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £265.12k | £258.33k | £232.08k | £183.14k | £239.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £197.95k | £241.40k | £235.76k | £230.04k | £244.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £53.94k | £58.25k | £72.82k | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.17k | £13.08k | N/A | £20.92k | £10.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SERVICES AND FACILITIES TO REHABILITATE AND RELIEVE FROM THEIR DISABILITIES PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED HEAD INJURIES AND WHO RESIDE IN LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND
Area of benefit
RESIDENTS OF LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Hospital Close
Leicester
LE5 4WP
- Phone:
- 01162739763
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window