Accounts and annual returns SCAWTHORPE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 1077175
Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 March 2025 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 10 March 2025 38 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 December 2024 313 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 December 2024 313 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 March 2021 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required