HELENA KENNEDY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting disadvantaged college leavers wishing to enter higher education and promoting progression to graduate employment. We do this through bursaries, skills training, mentoring and providing work placement opportunities. By promoting wider participation in higher education and fair access to the graduate professions we help students to overcome social injustice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 February 1999: Standard registration
- 18 April 2019: Funds received from 1099110 THE TRIBAL GROUP FOUNDATION
- HELENA KENNEDY BURSARY SCHEME (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JULIE MILLS | Chair | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Shimmin | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Le Feuvre | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Cooper | Trustee | 28 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Hess | Trustee | 28 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Iandra McCallum Tchoudnowsky | Trustee | 28 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mica Jayne Jones | Trustee | 28 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200.49k | £317.75k | £281.64k | £450.18k | £462.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £238.67k | £237.86k | £241.97k | £279.61k | £315.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FURTHER AND HIGHER EDUCATION IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS (1) IN AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO STUDENTS FROM FURTHER EDUCATION SECTOR COLLEGES WHO WISH TO UNDERTAKE A HIGHER EDUCATION PROGRAMME AT A UNIVERSITY OR COLLEGE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE (2) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN THE FORM OF A ONE OFF BURSARY PAYABLE TO A STUDENT DURING THE FIRST YEAR OF HIS OR HER HIGHER EDUCATION COURSE (3) IN MAKING A CONTRIBUTION TOWARDS THE TUITION FEES AND/OR THE MAINTENANCE COSTS OF STUDENTS WHO WISH TO PROGRESS FROM FURTHER EDUCATION COLLEGES INTO A HIGHER EDUCATION PROGRAMME (4) OTHERWISE IN FURTHERING THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
South and City College Birmingham
Handsworth Campus
The Council House
Soho Road
Birmingham
B21 9DP
- Phone:
- 0121 644 2406
- Email:
- enquiries@hkf.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.