PAKISTAN WELFARE ASSOCIATION SLOUGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aims and objectives of the Association are to provide welfare services to the Pakistani community in Slough,to promote racial harmony,to provide assistance and guidance to its members,to hold social events and celebrate National Days,to keep liaison with local authorities ,with a view to resolve various matters concerning the Pakistani Community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Slough
Governance
- 25 March 1999: Standard registration
- PWA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdul Sattar | Chair | 24 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Khurshid | Trustee | 24 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shaida Akbar | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Zafar Ullah Khan Adil | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.74k | £89.38k | £140.34k | £103.14k | £96.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.16k | £43.01k | £55.44k | £66.19k | £87.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £61.91k | £11.33k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 FEB 1999 AS AMENDED ON 12 SEP 1999
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF THE PAKISTANI RESIDENTS IN SLOUGH AND SURROUNDING ARCA, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF AN ADVICE SERVICE. (2) TO PROMOTE A RACIAL HARMONY AND BETTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN THE PAKISTANI AND THE PEOPLE FROM THE HOST COMMUNITY. (3) THE PROVISION OF SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS MEDIATION AS BETWEEN PERSONS, ORGANISATIONS, AUTHORITIES OR GROUPS LIKELY TO BECOME INVOLVED IN DISPUTE OR INTERPERSONAL CONFLICT WHICH MAY LEAD TO ACTS OF VIOLENCE, HARASSMENT, NUISANCE, CRIMINAL DAMAGE, RACIAL ABUSE, UNLAWFUL ACTIVITIES OR BREAKDOWN OF PUBLIC ORDER, AND TO WORK WITH PERSONS, ORGANISATIONS, AUTHORITIES OR GROUPS TOWARDS BENEFICIAL CHANGE BY PROVIDING FAIR, VOLUNTARY, IMPARTIAL, CONFIDENTIAL, FREE AND ACCESSIBLE MEDIATION. (4) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE SAFEGUARDING AND MAINTENANCE OF HEALTH, AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS OF THE PAKISTANI YOUTH IN SLOUGH AND SURROUNDING AREA (I) ESTABLISHING AND DEVELOPING A YOUTH ADVISORY SERVICE FOR THE GIVING OF INDIVIDUAL OR GROUP COUNSELLING AND PRACTICAL ADVICE; AND (II) HELPING THEM THROUGH LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES, SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
SLOUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
PAKISTANI WELFARE ASSOCIATION
DARVILLS LANE
SLOUGH
SL1 2PH
- Phone:
- 01753821003
- Email:
- info@pwasloughberks.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window