Financial history TAXAL & FERNILEE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS COMMITTEE

Charity Number: 1074782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £7.55k £5.49k £3.56k £6.39k £5.79k
Total expenditure £2.09k £7.95k £3.80k £13.91k £9.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A