BERKSHIRE AUTISTIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Improving and supporting the lives of autistic children, young people and adults, their parents, their families and carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £152,000 from 3 government contract(s) and £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bracknell Forest
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 22 June 1999: Standard registration
- Autism Berkshire (Working name)
- BAS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Connor O'Connor | Chair | 19 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Bates | Trustee | 04 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Bullard | Trustee | 04 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darren Jonathon Browne | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £197.97k | £239.28k | £208.27k | £271.47k | £230.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £247.37k | £238.97k | £201.70k | £262.66k | £231.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £73.48k | £73.03k | £127.92k | £180.02k | £152.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £67.81k | £17.76k | £5.00k | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/04/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 OCT 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 DEC 2016 as amended on 06 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SCHOOL AGE AND PRE-SCHOOL AGE CHILDREN AND ADULTS SUFFERING FROM AUTISM, AUTISTIC-RELATED PROBLEMS AND CHALLENGING BEHAVIOUR AND RESIDENT IN BERKSHIRE, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, OXFORDSHIRE AND MILTON KEYNES AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
BERKSHIRE, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, OXFORDSHIRE AND MILTON KEYNES AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Berkshire Autistic Society
Quadrant House
20 Broad Street Mall
READING
RG1 7QE
- Phone:
- 01189594594
- Email:
- ceo@autismberkshire.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window